CA SB228 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 703, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 703, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 532 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to military.
Title
Civilian youth opportunities program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - SB 228 Roth Senate Third Reading By Schiavo (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB228 Roth (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB228 Roth (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 703, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2992.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1296.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1161.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 855.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |