CA SB228 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 742, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 742, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 14 (commencing with Section 9850) to Division 8.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to aging.
Title
Master Plan on Aging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB228 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 228 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Reyes (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB228 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 228 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Reyes (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB228 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 742, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2784.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3180.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | July 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and HUM. S. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1093.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 775.) (April 22). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9850 | New Code | See Bill Text |