CA SB227 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-26 - August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 38010, 38012, 38014, 38170, 38225, 38286, 38365, and 38366 of, to amend and repeal Sections 38022, 38088, and 38232 of, and to add Section 38011 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Off-highway vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Asm. Jim Frazier [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D] | Asm. James Ramos [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Asm. Thurston Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB227 Jones et al (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB227 Jones et al (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and W.,P., & W. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 1388.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 938.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 12. Noes 2. Page 779.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E.Q. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS, N.R. & W., and EQ. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 38010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38011 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 38012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38022 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38088 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38232 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38286 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38365 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38366 | Amended Code | Citation Text |