CA SB226 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Set for hearing March 10.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Hearing: Mar 10 @ 1:00 pm in Senate Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 14087.385 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medi-Cal: County of Sacramento.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateSet for hearing March 10.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2021-01-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14087.385New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback