CA SB224 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 951, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 51.9 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 12930 and 12948 of the Government Code, relating to personal rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal rights: civil liability and enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 224 Jackson Senate Third Reading By REYES (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB224 Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 951, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6060.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6707.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2018-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4067.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4020.) (January 9).
2018-01-05SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2018-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-21SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-25SenateMay 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-01SenateMay 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 783.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2017-02-03SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
2017-02-02SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback