CA SB224 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3055 to the Penal Code, relating to parole.
Title
Elderly Parole Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Liu. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1149.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | April 20 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 507.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3055 | New Code | See Bill Text |