CA SB223 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 771, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 771, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1367.04 of, and to add Section 1367.042 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 10133.8 of, and to add Section 10133.11 to, the Insurance Code, and to amend Section 14029.91 of, and to add Sections 14029.92 and 14727 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care language assistance services.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB223 Atkins Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 223 Atkins Senate Third Reading By NAZARIAN (Y: 58 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB223 Atkins (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 223 Atkins Senate Third Reading By NAZARIAN (Y: 58 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB223 Atkins (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 771, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2924.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 21. Page 3265.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1266.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1179.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 807.) (April 19). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.032 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.042 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10133.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10133.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14029.91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14029.92 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14684 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14727 | New Code | See Bill Text |