CA SB221 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Sections 6011.3, 6012.4, and 10759.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use taxes: vehicle license fee: exclusion: alternative fuel motor vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2013-05-02SenateSet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-04-24SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2013-04-18SenateRe-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
2013-04-15SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2013-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2013-02-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
2013-02-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback