CA SB219 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4985.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property taxation: delinquent penalties and costs: cancellation: public health orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2021-03-25SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 611.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-03-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-03-25SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-03-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2021-03-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2021-03-16SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2021-03-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 479.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-02SenateSet for hearing March 11.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-01-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code4985.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback