CA SB218 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12993 of, and to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 12997) to Part 2.8 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to discrimination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment: discrimination enforcement: local government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB218 Bradford (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Assembly - SB 218 Bradford Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB218 Bradford (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB218 Bradford (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13 Veto sustained.
2020-01-13 Stricken from file.
2019-10-12 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-12 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2960.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 17. Page 3581.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 30).
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-10AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 9).
2019-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-13AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 1183.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1093.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 797.) (April 23).
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-02SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12993Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12997New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback