CA SB217 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1120 of the Evidence Code, relating to evidence.
Title
Evidence: admissibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - SB 217 Wieckowski Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB217 Wieckowski (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB217 Wieckowski (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2259.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 642.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 539.) (March 28). |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |