CA SB217 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 89500.5 to, and to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 92010) to Chapter 1 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: executive officer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB217 Yee (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB217 Yee (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-27 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-08-19 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 7.) | |
2009-06-08 | To Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2009-05-26 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 1005.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 725.) | |
2009-04-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 29. | |
2009-04-15 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-25 | Set for hearing April 15. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on ED. | |
2009-02-24 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2009-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |