CA SB215 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 634, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 634, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 680.1 and 680.3 of the Penal Code, relating to evidence.
Title
DNA evidence.
Sponsors
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 215 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB215 Leyva et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB215 Leyva et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 634, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2687.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1318.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1183.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | March 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 424.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 680.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 680.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |