CA SB214 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 306, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 32632, 32633, 32634, 32639, 32643, 32645, 32649, and 32651 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the San Diego River Conservancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

San Diego River Conservancy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB214 Atkins Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 214 Atkins Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB214 Atkins (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 306, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-18SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-12SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 6. Page 2788.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 3148.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-06-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 28).
2017-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-04-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 800.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 708.) (April 17).
2017-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-27SenateApril 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 364.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-02-14SenateSet for hearing March 14.
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-02-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback