CA SB206 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Set for hearing March 8.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Hearing: Mar 8 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3251 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighters Procedural Bill of Rights Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateSet for hearing March 8.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
2021-01-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code3251Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback