CA SB203 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 335, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 625.6 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles: custodial interrogation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB203 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 203 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Kamlager (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB203 Bradford (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 335, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 2.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 5306.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 20).
2020-08-18AssemblyAugust 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2020-08-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-08-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-27AssemblyAugust 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-01-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-01-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3130.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-01-16SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2020-01-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3099.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-08SenateSet for hearing January 15.
2020-01-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2020-01-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-01SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code625.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback