CA SB202 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 9205, 9212, 9221, and 9269 of, to add Sections 9204.5, 9205.5, 9205.7, 9213, and 9253 to, and to add and repeal Section 9254 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal blood donors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB202 Wilk et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 202 Wilk Senate Third Reading By Bloom (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB202 Wilk et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-13 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-18SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2866.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-11SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3263.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyAction rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time and amended.
2019-09-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-05AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-09AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2019-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2019-06-13AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGRI. and JUD.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1180.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-15SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-15SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 797.) (April 23).
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-10SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 2).
2019-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-13SenateRe-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and JUD.
2019-03-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-01SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback