CA SB200 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 53082.6 to the Government Code, to amend Sections 39719, 100827, 116275, 116385, 116530, 116540, and 116686 of, and to add Chapter 4.6 (commencing with Section 116765) to Part 12 of Division 104 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 8390) to Division 4.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to drinking water, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drinking water.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB200 Monning et al (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-24 Approved by the Governor.
2019-07-15SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-07-08SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1989.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-07-08SenateUrgency clause adopted.
2019-07-05SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-07-05AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2547.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-07-05AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 6. Page 2544.)
2019-07-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 2).
2019-06-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1222.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1092.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 777.) (April 23).
2019-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-03-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 383.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-03-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2019-03-08SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2019-03-08SenateApril 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-05SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
2019-02-01SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback