CA SB199 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-30 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-30 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 68085, 68085.1, 68085.7, 68632, 68645.2, 68645.4, and 68645.5 of, to add Section 29554 to, to add and repeal Section 71651.1 of, and to repeal Section 76223 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1208.2, 1214.1, 1463, 1463.001, and 1465.9 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 977 and 1043.5 of, and to add and repeal Section 977.3 of, the Penal Code, and to amend Section 40509 of the Vehicle Code, relating to courts, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB199 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 5550.) |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rules suspended. |
2022-06-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 301.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 29554 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 68085 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68085.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68085.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68632 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68645.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68645.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68645.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 71651.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1043.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1208.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1214.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1463 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1463.001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1465.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 977 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 40509 | Amended Code | Citation Text |