CA SB199 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 127672 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The California Health Care Cost, Quality, and Equity Atlas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB199 Hernandez et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-07-19AssemblyJuly 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1147.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-27SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 886.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-03SenateApril 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2017-01-31SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code127670New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code127672New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback