CA SB197 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6369.7 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use taxes: exemption: military and veteran medical facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB197 Bates et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-07-19AssemblyJuly 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-22AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2017-05-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2017-05-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 904.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-24SenatePublished April 20 at 9 p.m.
2017-04-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-20SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-04-20SenateRead third time and amended.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 708.) (April 17).
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 537.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-08SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-01-31SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6369.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback