CA SB188 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6245 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State lands: leasing: oil and gas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB188 Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 10).
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-06-08AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-05-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-04-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-06SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 643.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 362.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-02-23SenateSet for hearing March 14.
2017-02-02SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-01-26SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code179.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code6245New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code6501.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback