CA SB185 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 26062 and 26063 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: marketing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-29SenateApril 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2019-04-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 424.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing March 25.
2019-03-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and AGRI.
2019-01-31SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code14235.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code26062Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26063Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback