CA SB184 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 269, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 269, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 27202, 27203, 27203.5, 27210, 27211, 27230, 27231, 27256, 27257, 27320, 27321, 27321.5, 27360, 66497, and 66499.7 of, and to repeal Section 27251 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 5470, 5473.4, 5474.4, and 5474.5 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 20150.1, 20200, 22010, 22014, 22015, 22017, 22030, 22034, 22036, 22039, 22043, and 22044 of, and to add Section 22042.5 to, the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 8333, 8335, 36627, 36705, and 36718 of, and to add Section 36509.5 to, the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Sections 35406 and 37921 of the Water Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Edward Hernandez [D] |
Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-20 - Senate - Special Consent #6 SB184 Committee On GOV. & F. (Hertzberg) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Assembly - SB 184 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB184 Committee On GOV. & F. (Hertzberg) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - Assembly - SB 184 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB184 Committee On GOV. & F. (Hertzberg) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 269, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2431.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1030.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 960.) (May 11). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 815.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |