CA SB184 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 210, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 210, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11010.4 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 12419.8, 12419.10, 27201, 41802, 41803, 41805, 50281, 53243.4, 53395.1, 53395.2, 53395.10, 53395.13, 53395.14, 53395.17, 53395.85, 53396, 66428, 66442.5, and 66449 of the Government Code, to amend Section 9002 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 32556 of, and to repeal Sections 9973, 9974, 9975, 9976, 9977, and 9978 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Section 36622 of the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Sections 3.1, 23, and 29 of, and to repeal Section 24 of, the Kings River Conservation District Act (Chapter 931 of the Statutes of 1951), relating to local government.
Title
Local government: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] | Sen. Bill Emmerson [R] |
Sen. Edward Hernandez [D] | Sen. Steve Knight [R] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB184 Committee on GOV. & F. (Wolk) Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Assembly - SB 184 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By ACHADJIAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB184 Committee on GOV. & F. (Wolk) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Assembly - SB 184 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By ACHADJIAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB184 Committee on GOV. & F. (Wolk) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 210, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1947.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2597.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 2480.) |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 774.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 566.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |