CA SB184 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 34515 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Biennial inspection of terminals: fee schedule.
Sponsors
Sen. John Benoit [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-03-26 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-16 | Set for hearing March 31. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-02-18 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_184&sess=0910&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_184_bill_20090217_introduced.html |