CA SB179 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 853, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 853, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1277 and 1278 of, and to add Section 1277.5 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 103426 and 103440 of, to amend the heading of Article 7 (commencing with Section 103425) of Chapter 11 of Part 1 of Division 102 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 103425 and 103430 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 13005 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 12800 of the Vehicle Code, relating to gender identity.
Title
Gender identity: female, male, or nonbinary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB179 Atkins et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 179 Atkins Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB179 Atkins et al (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 179 Atkins Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB179 Atkins et al (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 853, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2923.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 3261.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 27). |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and TRANS. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1314.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1179.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 851.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 627.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1277 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1277.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1278 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 103425 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 103426 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 103430 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 103435 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 103440 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12800 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 12811 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 13005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |