CA SB178 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-30 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-30 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2022 by amending Items 0250-001-0001, 0250-001-3066, 0250-101-0001, 0250-101-0932, 0250-102-0159, 0250-102-0932, 0250-111-0001, 0250-113-0001, 0250-114-0001, 0250-115-0001, 0500-001-0001, 0509-001-0001, 0509-101-0001, 0509-101-3398, 0509-102-0001, 0511-001-0001, 0515-103-0001, 0515-105-0001, 0521-131-0001, 0530-001-0001, 0540-101-0001, 0540-102-0001, 0540-490, 0559-001-0001, 0650-001-0001, 0650-101-0001, 0690-001-0001, 0690-012-0001, 0690-101-0001, 0690-101-0890, 0690-490, 0820-001-0001, 0820-490, 0840-001-0001, 0840-001-9740, 0890-001-0001, 0954-101-0001, 0977-101-0001, 0985-220-0001, 1111-011-0001, 1115-001-3288, 1115-004-0001, 1115-102-0001, 1701-001-0001, 2240-104-0001, 2240-105-0001, 2240-106-0001, 2240-110-0001, 2240-111-0001, 2240-121-0001, 2240-122-0001, 2240-124-0001, 2240-125-0001, 2240-126-0001, 2660-302-0890, 2740-001-0044, 2740-490, 3125-001-0001, 3125-001-0568, 3340-001-0001, 3340-001-6088, 3355-001-0462, 3360-101-0001, 3480-001-0001, 3480-102-0001, 3540-001-0001, 3540-301-0001, 3540-301-0660, 3540-492, 3600-001-0001, 3720-001-0001, 3760-101-3228, 3760-105-0001, 3790-001-0001, 3790-002-0392, 3790-002-6088, 3790-003-0001, 3790-005-0001, 3790-101-0001, 3790-102-0001, 3790-301-0001, 3790-301-0263, 3790-491, 3790-492, 3855-001-8120, 3860-001-0001, 3860-101-0001, 3900-001-0115, 3900-101-0001, 3930-490, 3940-106-0001, 3960-001-0014, 3970-001-0001, 3970-101-3228, 4140-001-0001, 4140-001-3085, 4140-101-0001, 4140-101-3085, 4170-001-0001, 4170-101-0001, 4260-001-0001, 4260-101-0001, 4260-101-0890, 4260-115-0890, 4260-116-3397, 4260-101-3085, 4265-001-0001, 4265-001-3385, 4265-111-0001, 4265-111-3385, 4300-001-0001, 4300-101-0001, 4560-001-3085, 4560-101-3085, 4800-101-3381, 5160-001-0001, 5160-001-3397, 5175-101-0890, 5175-101-8004, 5180-001-0001, 5180-101-0001, 5180-101-0890, 5180-111-0001, 5180-141-0001, 5180-151-0001, 5180-151-0890, 5225-001-0001, 5225-002-0001, 5225-019-0001, 5225-020-0001, 5225-021-3398, 5227-119-0001, 5227-121-0001, 5227-124-0001, 6100-001-0001, 6100-004-0001, 6100-107-0001, 6100-110-0001, 6100-161-0001, 6100-161-0890, 6100-172-0001, 6100-194-0001, 6100-196-0001, 6100-220-0001, 6100-488, 6120-161-0001, 6360-001-0001, 6360-001-0408, 6440-001-0001, 6610-001-0001, 6610-002-0001, 6870-001-0001, 6870-101-0001, 6870-403, 6980-001-0001, 6980-101-0001, 7100-001-0001, 7100-001-0588, 7120-001-0001, 7120-101-0001, 7350-001-0001, 7350-001-3152, 7501-001-0001, 7730-001-0001, 7730-490, 7760-311-0001, 7870-001-0214, 7870-101-0001, 7870-111-0001, 8120-002-0001, 8120-491, 8260-101-0001, 8570-002-0001, 8570-102-0001, 8820-101-0001, 8880-001-9740, and 8940-301-0001 of Section 2.00 of, adding Items 0509-102-3398, 0690-006-0001, 0775-001-3085, 0840-001-3228, 0957-113-0001, 0974-113-0001, 2240-002-0890, 2240-102-0890, 2240-492, 3340-101-0001, 3360-002-0001, 3360-102-0001, 3540-101-0001, 3600-002-3288, 3600-005-0001, 3720-001-3228, 3760-102-0001, 3790-006-0001, 3790-012-0001, 3810-102-0001, 3845-102-0001, 3855-101-0001, 3860-001-3398, 3900-002-3228, 3900-101-3228, 3930-002-3288, 3930-102-3288, 3940-002-3288, 3940-101-0439, 4700-001-3398, 4700-101-3398, 5225-017-0001, 5225-022-0001, 5227-118-0001, 5227-123-0001, 6100-485, 7100-001-3288, 7100-004-0001, 7501-001-3085, 7600-002-3288, 7760-015-0001, 8880-011-0001, and 8880-011-9740 to Section 2.00 of, repealing Items 0511-002-0001, 0957-001-0001, 0957-101-0001, 2240-123-0001, 4260-011-3397, and 8570-101-3398 of Section 2.00 of, amending Sections 11.96, 12.00, 12.32, 19.54, 19.55, 20.00, 35.50, 39.00, and 99.50 of, adding Section 19.56 to, and repealing Sections 6.15 and 35.70 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB178 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 5550.) |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rules suspended. |
2022-06-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 294.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |