CA SB177 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the Budget Act of 2022.
Title
Budget Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB177 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 2809.) |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 294.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 367.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 367.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50050 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 68645 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 69951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 77205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1001.90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1202.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1203.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1203.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1203.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1214.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1465.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2085.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 2085.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 2085.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 40508.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40510.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |