CA SB177 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4364.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cognitively impaired adults: caregiver resource centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2017-05-25SenateMay 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-17SenateApril 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-04-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 558.) (March 29).
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2017-02-02SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-01-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4364.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback