CA SB175 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 884, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6500, 6509, and 7505 of, and to add Section 7502.6 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Developmental services: Canyon Springs Community Facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB175 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 175 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Human Services] and [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB175 McGuire (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 884, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5684.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-24SenateUrgency clause adopted.
2018-08-21SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5578.)
2018-08-21SenateSet for hearing August 21.
2018-08-20SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5450.) Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2018-08-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6309.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-21AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-06-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-06-04AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGRI. and B. & P.
2017-04-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 4. Page 765.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 488.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-03-16SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2017-02-02SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-01-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback