CA SB172 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 60640 of, to add Section 60851.5 to, and to add and repeal Section 60851.6 of, the Education Code, relating to pupil testing.
Title
Pupil testing: high school exit examination: suspension.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB172 Liu Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 172 Liu Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-04 - Assembly - SB 172 Liu Senate Third Reading By BONILLA Amend By BONILLA Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB172 Liu (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 172 Liu Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-04 - Assembly - SB 172 Liu Senate Third Reading By BONILLA Amend By BONILLA Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB172 Liu (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2672.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 2967.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2898.) Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27). |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1197.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1148.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 647.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 60640 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60851.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 60851.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |