CA SB171 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 128555 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Sections 14197.1, 14197.2, and 14197.4 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Medi-Cal: Medi-Cal managed care plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB171 Hernandez et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 171 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB171 Hernandez et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 171 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB171 Hernandez et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3009.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3495.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1271.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1178.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 885.) (April 26). |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 128555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.035 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10950 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10959.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |