CA SB171 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4004 of, and to add Section 4004.6 to, the Penal Code, relating to imprisonment, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
County jail inmates: involuntary transfer.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-12 | Senate | January 12 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 12. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | May 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 4004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4004.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |