CA SB17 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - August 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12816 to, and to add and repeal Chapter 4.6 (commencing with Section 8303) of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Racial Equity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB17 Pan et al (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-23AssemblyAugust 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-07-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 30).
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 1384.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1179.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 775.) (April 13).
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 13.
2021-04-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 588.) (March 23).
2021-03-16SenateSet for hearing March 23.
2021-03-11SenateRe-referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
2021-02-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12816New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8303New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback