CA SB169 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 345, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 345, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 538d of the Penal Code, relating to crime.
Title
Identification: honorably retired peace officers.
Sponsors
Sen. John Benoit [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent #15 SB169 Benoit (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-16 - Assembly - SB 169 Benoit Senate Third Reading By GILMORE (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB169 Benoit (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-16 - Assembly - SB 169 Benoit Senate Third Reading By GILMORE (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB169 Benoit (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 345, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-10 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2009-09-08 | Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Ordered held in Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2009-08-27 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10 a.m. | |
2009-08-24 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1922.) To enrollment. | |
2009-08-20 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-16 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-07-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2539.) To Senate. | |
2009-07-13 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 2478.) To third reading. | |
2009-06-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.) | |
2009-05-27 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-05-11 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-04-20 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 543.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-16 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 480.) | |
2009-03-19 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-02-15 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2009-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |