CA SB168 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14549 of, to add Sections 14514.2 and 14548 to, and to add and repeal Section 14549.7 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recycling: beverage containers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB168 Wieckowski (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB168 Wieckowski Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB168 Wieckowski (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-15AssemblyAugust 15 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-05-24AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 4112.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-01-18SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-01-18SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-06-01SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator Wieckowski.
2017-06-01SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1394.)
2017-06-01SenateMotion to reconsider made by Senator Wieckowski.
2017-06-01SenateRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 14. Noes 17. Page 1394.)
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1178.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 783.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-03-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-02-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-02SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code12024.13New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code21608.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code23671New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1720.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code12165Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code186.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code186.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code14315New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code14514.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code14526.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14548New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code14549Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14549.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14550Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14571.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14571.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14591Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code17000New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code17001New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code17002Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code19535New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code31178New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code40003New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code42476New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code42889New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code48653New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code5845.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code615New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17153.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code24315Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2370New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code2382New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code79714New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback