CA SB168 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 43.101 to the Civil Code, to add Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 853) to Part 2 of Division 3.6 of Title 1 of the Government Code, and to add Section 402.5 to the Penal Code, relating to unmanned aircraft systems, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Unmanned aircraft systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 6)SB1 68 Gai nes Urg (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - SB 168 Gaines Third Reading Urgency By GATTO (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB168 Gaines Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - SB 168 Gaines Third Reading Urgency By GATTO (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB168 Gaines Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2015-10-03 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2015-10-03 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2785.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 11). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3193.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3102.) Art. IV. Sec. 8(b) of the Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3103.) |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2277.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2235.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Set for hearing August 27 in APPR. pending receipt. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Set for hearing August 27. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 43.101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 853 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 402.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |