CA SB163 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the Budget Act of 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB163 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-15AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-09-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2021-09-10AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2021-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 78 suspended.
2021-09-09AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Ting.
2021-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-07AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2021-09-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 2809.)
2021-09-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-25Assembly(Corrected May 14).
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-02-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 289.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-02-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-16SenateOrdered to second reading.
2021-02-16SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-01-11SenateRead first time.
2021-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2021-01-08SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback