CA SB162 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2690.5 to the Penal Code, relating to prisoners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisoners: temporary removal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-24 - Assembly - SB 162 Lieu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB162 Lieu (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-03 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2013.
2013-07-03 Approved by the Governor.
2013-06-26SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2013-06-24SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-06-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2132.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-06-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2013-05-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-05-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-06SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 808.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-01SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-04-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 665.) (April 23).
2013-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2013-02-14SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
2013-02-04SenateRead first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
2013-02-01SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code2690.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_162&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20130201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20130501_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20130625_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_bill_20130703_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20130423_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20130506_0116PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20130618_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0151-0200/sb_162_vote_20130624_0105PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback