CA SB162 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 50078.1 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: fire suppression.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-01 Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2009-03-09 To Com. on RLS.
2009-02-15 From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2009-02-14 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback