CA SB161 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11370.4 and 11372 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances: fentanyl.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [03-26-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2020-01-14SenateJanuary 14 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3087.)
2020-01-07SenateSet for hearing January 14.
2019-03-26SenateMarch 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 1. Page 440.) Reconsideration granted.
2019-02-27SenateSet for hearing March 26.
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-01-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11370.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11372Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback