CA SB160 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8593.3.5 to the Government Code, relating to emergencies.
Title
Emergency services: cultural competence.
Sponsors
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] |
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB160 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 160 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Limón (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB160 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 160 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Limón (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB160 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3331.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1091.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | March 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8593.3.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |