CA SB16 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1045 of the Evidence Code, and to amend Sections 832.5, 832.7, and 832.12 of, and to add Section 832.13 to, the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace officers: release of records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB16 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Assembly - SB 16 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Grayson (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB16 Skinner (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-02SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2356.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-01SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 2660.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-08AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 6).
2021-06-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 1384.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1179.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 775.) (April 13).
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 13.
2021-03-18SenateMarch 23 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-03-12SenateSet for hearing March 23.
2021-03-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 423.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-02-17SenateSet for hearing March 9.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Evidence Code1045Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code832.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code832.13New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code832.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code832.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB16
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB16#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB16#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB16#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB16#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB16#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB16#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB16#93CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB16

Bill Comments

feedback