CA SB16 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 15205) to Part 6 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to counties, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Administration of justice: county costs: nonhomicide criminal trials.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB16 Gaines Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB16 Gaines Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2686.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2644.) (January 23). |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 937.) (May 15). |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and PUB. S. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 27701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |