CA SB159 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21809 of, and to amend and repeal Section 25253 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: emergency vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-16 - Assembly - SB 159 Simitian Senate Third Reading By DE LEON (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB159 Simitian (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB159 Simitian (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-07-27 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2009-07-16 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-07-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2542.) To Senate. | |
2009-07-06 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-02 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.) | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |
2009-05-11 | To Com. on TRANS. | |
2009-04-23 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-04-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 619.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-21 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 555.) | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 398.) | |
2009-03-16 | Set for hearing March 31. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-02-15 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2009-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |