CA SB158 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 15250 of, to add Section 15250.1 to, and to add and repeal Section 15250.2 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to commercial vehicle drivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial driver’s license: education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB158 Monning et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-05-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 903.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 24).
2017-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-04-17SenateApril 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-02-02SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-01-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
2017-01-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code15250Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code15250.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code15250.2Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback