CA SB158 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15250 of, to add Section 15250.1 to, and to add and repeal Section 15250.2 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to commercial vehicle drivers.
Title
Commercial driver’s license: education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB158 Monning et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB158 Monning et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 903.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 24). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 15250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 15250.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 15250.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |