CA SB1575 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 799, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 799, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1640, 1715.5, 1934, 1950.5, 2021, 2064, 2184, 2220, 2424, 2516, 2518, 2570.13, 2904.5, 3057.5, 3742, 3750, 3750.5, 4209, 4980.04, 4980.34, 4980.397, 4980.398, 4980.399, 4980.40, 4980.43, 4980.44, 4980.48, 4980.50, 4980.78, 4980.80, 4984.01, 4984.4, 4984.7, 4984.72, 4989.16, 4989.42, 4992.05, 4992.07, 4992.09, 4992.1, 4996.1, 4996.3, 4996.4, 4996.6, 4996.28, 4999.22, 4999.32, 4999.45, 4999.46, 4999.50, 4999.52, 4999.53, 4999.55, 4999.57, 4999.58, 4999.59, 4999.62, 4999.63, 4999.64, 4999.76, 4999.90, 4999.100, 4999.106, and 4999.120 of, to add Sections 719, 1902.2, 1958.1, and 4300.1 to, and to repeal Section 1909.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professions and vocations.
Sponsors
Sen. Ellen Corbett [D] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Bill Emmerson [R] | Sen. Edward Hernandez [D] |
Sen. Gloria McLeod [D] | Sen. Curren Price [D] | Sen. Tony Strickland [R] | Sen. Juan Vargas [D] |
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1575 Committee on B.P. & E.D. (Price) Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1575 B. P.& E.D. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Special Consent #10 SB1575 Committee on B.P. & E.D. (Price) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1575 B. P.& E.D. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Special Consent #10 SB1575 Committee on B.P. & E.D. (Price) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 799, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4858.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-16 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5972.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-08-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-20 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |
2012-06-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-05-25 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-05-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3495.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-09 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-05-08 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-07 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3260.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-04-11 | Set for hearing April 23. | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-03-13 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 12. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |