CA SB157 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11489 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 13821, 13848.4, 14300, 14301, 14306, 14307, 14309, and 14314 of the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement, and making an appropriation therefor, a bill relating to the budget to take effect immediately.
Title
Crime prevention: enforcement and training programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Assembly - SB 157 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB157 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB157 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB157 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB157 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1767.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2194.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 2188.) |
2021-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 287.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11489 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13821 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13848.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 14300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 14301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 14306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 14307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 14309 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 14314 | Amended Code | Citation Text |